VA HB396 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Water and wastewater utilities; delinquent payment of rates and charges. Removes the authority of localities and Water and Waste Authorities to hold a non-occupying owner of premises liable for delinquent rates or charges incurred by a tenant or lessee unless the owner is the same person contracting for the service.
Title
Water and wastewater utilities; delinquent payment of rates and charges.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | House: Left in Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2010-01-28 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2010-01-21 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #2 | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102625D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB396 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB396+hil |