VA HB396 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0516)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0516)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Redevelopment and housing authority; compensation of commissioners. Increases from $150 to $500 per month the maximum compensation that may be paid to a redevelopment and housing authority commissioner.
Title
Redevelopment and housing authority; increases compensation of commissioners.
Sponsors
Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 1-N) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (82-Y 16-N) (Y: 82 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 1-N) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (82-Y 16-N) (Y: 82 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0516) | |
2020-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 516 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB396ER) |
2020-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-11 | House | VOTE: Passage (82-Y 16-N) |
2020-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House (82-Y 16-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-06 | House | Reported from General Laws (19-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection |
2020-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101023D |