VA HB438 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Petition for child custody or visitation. Provides that issues of child custody or visitation may be included in a single petition in juvenile and domestic relations district court and that such issues may be included in a single petition involving two or more children if such children have the same parents or legal guardians. The bill also provides that any person, agency, or institution authorized to inspect the case files relating to any juvenile subject to such a petition may inspect the entire case file related to the petition. The bill further requires that the court records in a case in which a single petition for multiple children has been filed be destroyed after (i) the youngest child subject to the petition has reached 19 years of age and (ii) five years have elapsed since the last hearing in the case.
Title
Child custody or visitation; petition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2014-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-01-23 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay |
2014-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-01-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 1-N) |
2014-01-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-01-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) |
2014-01-09 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2014-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101966D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 260 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |