VA HB438 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0513)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0513)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Elementary and secondary schools; sexual misconduct. Requires the Department of Education and local school boards to adopt policies to implement the provisions of federal law that prohibit any local school board or any individual who is an employee, contractor, or agent of a local school board from assisting an employee, contractor, or agent of such local school board in obtaining a new job if such local school board or individual knows or has probable cause to believe that the employee, contractor, or agent engaged in sexual misconduct regarding a minor or student in violation of law. This bill is identical to SB 605.
Title
School boards, local, etc.; prohibits assisting person for new job if engaged in misconduct w/minor.
Sponsors
Del. David Bulova [D] | Del. David Reid [D] | Del. Kathy Tran [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0513) | |
2018-03-29 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 513 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-14 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 14, 2018 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB438ER) |
2018-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-01 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-01 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 18107623D-S1 (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB438S1 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Newman agreed to 18107623D-S1 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 18107623D-S1 (Newman) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB438H1 |
2018-02-12 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18106932D-H1 |
2018-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-09 | House | Committee substitute printed 18106932D-H1 |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102260D |