VA HB438 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - Incorporated by General Laws
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - Incorporated by General Laws
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public Procurement Act; architectural and professional engineering term contracting; limitations. Provides that limitations imposed upon certain single-project fees shall not apply to localities with a population in excess of 400,000.
Title
Virginia Public Procurement Act; architectural and professional engineering term contracting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | House | Incorporated by General Laws |
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB429-Bulova) by voice vote |
2022-01-21 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102706D |
Same As/Similar To
HB429 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0504)
HB429 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0504)
HB429 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0504)