VA HB438 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0809)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0809)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Written complaints; felony offenses. Provides that a written complaint is required for a felony offense, regardless of whether the complainant is a law-enforcement officer. Current law only requires a written complaint for any offense if the complainant is not a law-enforcement officer. The bill also provides that if no arrest warrant is issued in response to a written complaint made by a complainant, whether the complainant is a law-enforcement officer or not, the written complaint shall be returned to the complainant. Written complaints; felony offenses. Provides that a written complaint is required for a felony offense, regardless of whether the complainant is a law-enforcement officer. Current law only requires a written complaint for any offense if the complainant is not a law-enforcement officer. The bill also provides that if no arrest warrant is issued in response to a written complaint made by a complainant, whether the complainant is a law-enforcement officer or not, the written complaint shall be returned to the complainant.
Title
Written complaints; felony offenses to be provided.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House: VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House: VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0809) | |
2024-04-17 | House | Enacted, Chapter 809 (effective 7/1/24) |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2024-04-17 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2024-04-17 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB438ER2) |
2024-04-17 | House | Reenrolled |
2024-04-17 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-04-17 | House | BLOCK VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-04-17 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-09 | House | Passed by until Reconvene, Wednesday, April 17, 2024 |
2024-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-03-08 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2024-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-01 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 2024 |
2024-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB438ER) |
2024-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-01 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-31 | House | Printed as engrossed 24102515D-E |
2024-01-31 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB438E |
2024-01-31 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2024-01-31 | House | Read second time |
2024-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2024-01-26 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-18 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2024-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102515D |