VA HB501 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0762)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0762)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Counting students granted in-state tuition for certain purposes. Requires (i) students who live outside the Commonwealth, have been employed full time inside Virginia for at least one year, and were granted in-state tuition and (ii) any active duty members, activated guard or reservist members, or guard or reservist members mobilized or on temporary active orders for six months or more residing in Virginia who were granted in-state tuition to be counted as in-state students for the purposes of determining college admissions, enrollment, and tuition and fee revenue policies. The bill requires (a) any person who is enrolled in certain programs, domiciled in, and entitled to reduced tuition charges in a Southern Regional Education Compact member state that has similar reciprocal provisions for persons domiciled in Virginia, (b) any student from a foreign country who is enrolled in a foreign exchange program during the same period that an exchange student from the same state institution entitled to in-state tuition is attending the foreign institution, and (c) any high school or magnet school student who is enrolled in courses specifically designed as part of the high school or magnet school curriculum in a community college pursuant to a dual enrollment agreement, granted in-state tuition to be counted as out-of-state students for the purposes of determining college admissions, enrollment, and tuition and fee revenue policies.
Title
Tuition, in-state; counting out-of-state students for certain purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 14-N) (Y: 86 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 14-N) (Y: 86 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0762) | |
2014-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 762 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB501ER) |
2014-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-10 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 14-N) |
2014-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (84-Y 14-N) |
2014-02-07 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-05 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2014-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2014-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102007D |