VA HB514 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0169)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0169)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Governor's Agriculture and Forestry Industries Development Fund; wild fish and shellfish. Clarifies that commercially harvested wild fish and commercially harvested wild shellfish are included within the definition of "agricultural products." The Governor's Agriculture and Forestry Industries Development Fund provides grants or loans to expand the processing of Virginia-grown agriculture and forestry products.
Title
Governor's Agriculture and Forestry Industries Development Fund; wild fish and shellfish.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0169) | |
2016-03-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 169 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 3, 2016 | |
2016-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 02/25/16 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB514ER) |
2016-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-01-26 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-26 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-25 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB514H1 |
2016-01-25 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 16104436D-H1 |
2016-01-25 | House | Read second time |
2016-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2016-01-20 | House | Committee substitute printed 16104436D-H1 |
2016-01-20 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-13 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Agriculture |
2016-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2016-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100659D |