VA HB517 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0046)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0046)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Collaborative practice agreements; nurse practitioners; physician assistants. Adds nurse practitioners and physician assistants to the list of health care practitioners who shall not be required to participate in a collaborative agreement with a pharmacist and his designated alternate pharmacists, regardless of whether a professional business entity on behalf of which the person is authorized to act enters into a collaborative agreement with a pharmacist and his designated alternate pharmacists. As introduced, this bill is a recommendation of the Joint Commission on Healthcare.
Title
Collaborative practice agreements; adds nurse practitioners and physician assistants to list.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0046) | |
2020-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 46 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-24 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 2, 2020 | |
2020-02-24 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 24, 2020 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB517ER) |
2020-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-27 | House | VOTE: (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-24 | House | Printed as engrossed 20103193D-E |
2020-01-24 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB517E |
2020-01-24 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-01-24 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-21 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Health Professions |
2020-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103193D |
Same As/Similar To
SB565 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0232)