VA HB519 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0183)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0183)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; notice of termination to contain legal aid information. Provides that no notice of termination of tenancy served upon a tenant receiving tenant-based rental assistance through (i) the Housing Choice Voucher Program, 42 U.S.C. § 1437f(o), or (ii) any other federal, state, or local program by a private landlord is effective unless it contains on its first page, in type no smaller or less legible than that otherwise used in the body of the notice, the statewide legal aid telephone number and website address.
Title
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; certain notices of termination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate receded from substitute (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (1-Y 98-N) (Y: 1 N: 98 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (78-Y 21-N) (Y: 78 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (1-Y 98-N) (Y: 1 N: 98 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (78-Y 21-N) (Y: 78 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0183) | |
2020-03-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 183 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-05 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 6, 2020 | |
2020-03-05 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 5, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB519ER) |
2020-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate receded from substitute (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 98-N) |
2020-02-19 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 20108223D-S1 (1-Y 98-N) |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB519S1 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108223D-S1 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108223D-S1 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-27 | House | VOTE: Passage (78-Y 21-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Read third time and passed House (78-Y 21-N) |
2020-01-24 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB519H1 |
2020-01-24 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20105928D-H1 |
2020-01-24 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-21 | House | Committee substitute printed 20105928D-H1 |
2020-01-21 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection |
2020-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103977D |
Same As/Similar To
SB115 (Same As) 2020-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0182)