VA HB532 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0235)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0235)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Home service contract providers. Exempts any home service contract provider that has a net worth in excess of $100 million from the provisions of Article 2 of Chapter 26 of Title 38.2 of the Virginia Code, which provides for the licensure regulation of such providers by the State Corporation Commission.
Title
Home service contract providers; exempts those that have certain worth from licensure regulation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0235) | |
2010-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 235 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-03 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB532ER) | |
2010-03-03 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-02-24 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-01-27 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-27 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-26 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-01-25 | House: Read first time | |
2010-01-21 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100383D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 2617 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 2618 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 2619 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |