VA HB54 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on November 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-10 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-10 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
False representation of military status; stolen valor; penalty. Provides that any person who, with the intent to obtain money, property, or other tangible benefit, falsely represents himself to be a member or veteran of the military, or a recipient of any decoration or medal created by federal or state law to honor members or veterans of the military, and obtains such money, property, or other tangible benefit is guilty of larceny.
Title
False representation of military status; stolen valor, penalty.
Sponsors
Del. Scott Lingamfelter [R] | Del. Richard Anderson [R] | Del. Nicholas Freitas [R] | Del. Christopher Peace [R] |
Del. Charles Poindexter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-10 | House | Incorporated by Courts of Justice |
2016-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB1319-Collins) by voice vote |
2016-01-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2015-11-30 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-11-30 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100019D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1319 (Similar To) 2016-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0236)
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB54 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB54+hil |