VA HB606 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Department of Historic Resources; telecommunications; Section 106 review process work group. Directs the Virginia Department of Historic Resources to convene a stakeholder work group to study the efficiency of the review process as it is used in telecommunications projects with regard to Section 106 of the National Historic Preservation Act and the effects of certain projects upon historic properties in association with Federal Communications Commission applications and to report its findings to the General Assembly no later than November 1, 2018.
Title
Telecommunications; Dept. of Historic Resources to convene work group to examine Sect. 106 review.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Rules |
2018-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104099D |