VA HB63 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0592)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0592)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; provisional ballots; electoral board meetings. Provides that the meeting of the electoral board on the day or days following an election is open only to authorized party and candidate representatives, the persons who cast the provisional ballots with their representatives or legal counsel, and the staff and legal counsel for the electoral board. The bill also specifies that the party and candidate representatives attend as observers and not as participants.
Title
Provisional ballots; electoral board meeting opened only to authorized party to determine validity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 31-N) (Y: 69 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 31-N) (Y: 69 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0592) | |
2012-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 592 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-07 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-05 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-05 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB63ER) | |
2012-03-05 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Chair votes Yes | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Passed Senate (20-Y 20-N) | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Chair votes Yes | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Passed Senate (20-Y 20-N) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-21 | Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 7-N) | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Assigned to P&E sub: Campaigns and Elections | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-01 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 31-N) | |
2012-02-01 | House: Read third time and passed House (67-Y 31-N) | |
2012-01-31 | House: Printed as engrossed 12101201D-E | |
2012-01-31 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB63E | |
2012-01-31 | House: Pending question ordered | |
2012-01-31 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2012-01-31 | House: Read second time | |
2012-01-30 | House: Read first time | |
2012-01-27 | House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (17-Y 5-N) | |
2012-01-17 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 1-N) | |
2012-01-12 | House: Assigned P & E sub: Elections Subcommittee | |
2011-12-19 | House: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2011-12-19 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101201D |