VA HB634 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Senate: Left in General Laws and Technology
Pending: Senate General Laws and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Senate: Left in General Laws and Technology
Pending: Senate General Laws and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Board for Architects, Professional Engineers, Land Surveyors, Certified Interior Designers and Landscape Architects; exceptions from licensure. Provides an exemption from licensure for certain conduct related to the design of alternative onsite sewage systems receiving residential wastewater. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Architects, Professional Engineers, Land Surveyors, etc., Board for; exceptions from licensure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (81-Y 18-N) (Y: 83 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-02-11 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Senate: Left in General Laws and Technology | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-16 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (81-Y 18-N) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read third time and passed House (81-Y 18-N) | |
2010-02-15 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-02-14 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-11 | House: Reported from General Laws (18-Y 3-N) | |
2010-02-09 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-26 | House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N) | |
2010-01-19 | House: Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100970D |