VA HB641 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-24 - Senate: Pursuant to Senate Rule 20(L)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-24 - Senate: Pursuant to Senate Rule 20(L)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Freedom of Information Act; requests for records. Provides that FOIA requests may be made by any citizen of the United States and not just citizens of the Commonwealth and extends the same privilege to representatives of newpapers and magazines. The bill provides that this privilege is limited to those states which give reciprocal rights to make FOIA requests to Virginia citizens.The bill also allows a public body to require prepayment before providing requested records when the amount for so producing is likely to exceed $100.
Title
Freedom of Information Act; requests for records may be made by any citizen of United States.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2011 in General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-24 | Senate: Pursuant to Senate Rule 20(L) | |
2010-02-24 | Senate: Subject matter referred by letter to the Freedom of Information Advisory Council | |
2010-02-24 | Senate: Continued to 2011 in General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-16 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | House: Printed as engrossed 10102068D-E | |
2010-02-15 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB641E | |
2010-02-15 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2010-02-15 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-14 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-11 | House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-11 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-19 | House: Assigned GL sub: #2 FOIA/Procurement | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102068D |