VA HB646 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-09 - Continued to 2025 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-09 - Continued to 2025 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Zoning; certified recovery residence. Requires that a locality's zoning ordinances for all purposes shall consider a certified recovery residence in which individuals with substance use disorder reside as residential occupancy by a single family. The bill specifies that no conditions more restrictive than those imposed on residences occupied by persons related by blood, marriage, or adoption shall be imposed on such certified recovery residence.
Title
Zoning; certified recovery residence.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-09 | House | Continued to 2025 in Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote |
2024-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2025 by voice vote |
2024-01-16 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100512D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+sum+HB646 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+HB646+hil |