VA HB648 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1066)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1066)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Prescription Monitoring Program; information disclosed to the Emergency Department Care Coordination Program; redisclosure. Provides for the mutual exchange of information between the Prescription Monitoring Program and the Emergency Department Care Coordination Program and clarifies that nothing shall prohibit the redisclosure of confidential information from the Prescription Monitoring Program or any data or reports produced by the Prescription Monitoring Program disclosed to the Emergency Department Care Coordination Program to a prescriber in an electronic report generated by the Emergency Department Care Coordination Program so long as the electronic report complies with relevant federal law and regulations governing privacy of health information.
Title
Prescription Monitoring Program; information disclosed to Emergency Department Care Coord. Program.
Sponsors
Del. Chris Hurst [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request for second conference committee (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (2-Y 97-N 1-A) (Y: 2 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request for second conference committee (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (2-Y 97-N 1-A) (Y: 2 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1066) | |
2020-04-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1066 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-20 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-18 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB648ER) |
2020-03-18 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-07 | House | VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-07 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | Delegates: Hurst, Adams, D.M., Hodges |
2020-03-05 | House | Second conferees appointed by House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senators: Dunnavant, Petersen, Barker |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Second conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate acceded to request for second conference committee (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | House requested second conference committee |
2020-03-05 | House | Speaker ruled conference report not germane |
2020-03-05 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senators: Dunnavant, Petersen, Barker |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-02-24 | House | Delegates: Hurst, Adams, D.M., Hodges |
2020-02-24 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-02-24 | House | House acceded to request |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendments (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 97-N 1-A) |
2020-02-19 | House | Senate amendments rejected by House (2-Y 97-N 1-A) |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendments (12-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-27 | House | VOTE: (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-24 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-21 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Health Professions |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105052D |
Same As/Similar To
SB575 (Same As) 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1067)