VA HB705 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-01-28 - House: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (HB223-Cosgrove) by voice vote
Status: Introduced on January 8 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-01-28 - House: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (HB223-Cosgrove) by voice vote
Summary
Sex offenses prohibiting proximity to children; penalty. Adds publicly operated recreation centers and community center facilities serving children to those places where a person convicted of certain sexual offenses defined as "sex offenses prohibiting proximity to children" is prohibited from loitering within 100 feet of. This bill has been incorporated into
Title
Children; person convicted of sexual offenses prohibited near recreation centers, etc.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-01-28 | House: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (HB223-Cosgrove) by voice vote | |
2008-01-16 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2008-01-08 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-08 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 086198424 |
Same As/Similar To
HB223 (Similar To) 2008-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0579)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB705 |