VA HB705 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0564)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0564)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Workers' Compensation Commission; awards. Repeals provisions that require the Workers' Compensation Commission to send copies of awards by priority mail with delivery confirmation or equivalent mailing option. The measure also increases the period in which an application for review of an award may be made from 20 to 30 days.
Title
Workers' Compensation Commission; repeals requirement of sending copies of awards by priority mail.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0564) | |
2010-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 564 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-03 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB705ER) | |
2010-03-03 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-02-24 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 1-N) | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-01-27 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-27 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-26 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-01-25 | House: Read first time | |
2010-01-21 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101479D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 2 | 704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
65 | 2 | 705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
65 | 2 | 706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |