VA HB71 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0097)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0097)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Combined sewer overflow outfalls; compliance with regulations; Chesapeake Bay Watershed. Extends from July 1, 2025, to July 1, 2026, the date by which certain combined sewer overflow (CSO) outfalls that discharge into the Chesapeake Bay Watershed must be in compliance with Virginia law, the federal Clean Water Act, and the Presumption Approach described in the EPA CSO Control Policy, unless a higher level of control is necessary to comply with a total maximum daily load.
Title
Combined sewer overflow outfalls; compliance with regulations, Chesapeake Bay Watershed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0097) | |
2024-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 97 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB71ER) |
2024-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-01-30 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-29 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2024-01-24 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-15 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake |
2023-12-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2023-12-22 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101008D |
Same As/Similar To
SB372 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0006)
Subjects
Chesapeake Bay
Sewage Disposal and Sewerage Systems
Uncodified Legislation
Waters of the State Ports and Harbors
Sewage Disposal and Sewerage Systems
Uncodified Legislation
Waters of the State Ports and Harbors