VA HB721 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-20 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-20 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Towing and Recovery Operators. Abolishes the Board of Towing and Recovery Operators.
Title
Towing and Recovery Operators, Board of; abolishes Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-20 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2012-02-10 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2012-02-10 | House: Assigned App. sub: Transportation | |
2012-02-09 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-09 | House: Committee substitute printed 12105258D-H1 | |
2012-02-09 | House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (19-Y 3-N) | |
2012-02-08 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) | |
2012-02-07 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #2 | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102582D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 4024 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1217 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2800 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2828 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |