VA HB737 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Paid family and medical leave insurance program; notice requirements; civil action. Requires the Virginia Employment Commission to establish and administer a paid family and medical leave insurance program with benefits beginning January 1, 2027. Under the program, benefits are paid to covered individuals, as defined in the bill, for family and medical leave. Funding for the program is provided through premiums assessed to employers and employees beginning January 1, 2026. The bill provides that the amount of a benefit is 80 percent of the employee's average weekly wage, not to exceed 80 percent of the state weekly wage, which amount is required to be adjusted annually to reflect changes in the statewide average weekly wage. The bill caps the duration of paid leave at 12 weeks in any application year and provides self-employed individuals the option of participating in the program. Paid family and medical leave insurance program; notice requirements; civil action. Requires the Virginia Employment Commission to establish and administer a paid family and medical leave insurance program with benefits beginning January 1, 2027. Under the program, benefits are paid to covered individuals, as defined in the bill, for family and medical leave. Funding for the program is provided through premiums assessed to employers and employees beginning January 1, 2026. The bill provides that the amount of a benefit is 80 percent of the employee's average weekly wage, not to exceed 80 percent of the state weekly wage, which amount is required to be adjusted annually to reflect changes in the statewide average weekly wage. The bill caps the duration of paid leave at 12 weeks in any application year and provides self-employed individuals the option of participating in the program.
Title
Paid family and medical leave insurance program; notice requirements, civil action.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2024-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-30 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce (12-Y 10-N) |
2024-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2024-01-16 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104612D |
Same As/Similar To
SB373 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - Senate sustained Governor's veto