VA HB739 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0659)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0659)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia College Savings Plan Oversight Act. Directs the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission (JLARC) to oversee and evaluate the Virginia College Savings Plan on a continuing basis. The bill requires JLARC and the Virginia College Savings Plan to make certain reports to the General Assembly.
Title
Virginia College Savings Plan; JLARC to oversee and evaluate, report.
Sponsors
Del. David Albo [R] | Del. Anne Crockett-Stark [R] | Del. Gordon Helsel [R] | Del. Keith Hodges [R] |
Del. Chris Jones [R] | Del. James Massie [R] | Del. David Ramadan [R] | Del. Thomas Rust [R] |
Del. Ron Villanueva [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0659) | |
2012-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 659 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-07 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-05 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-05 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB739ER) | |
2012-03-05 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-13 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-10 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB739H1 | |
2012-02-10 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12104785D-H1 | |
2012-02-10 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-07 | House: Committee substitute printed 12104785D-H1 | |
2012-02-07 | House: Reported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-20 | House: Assigned Rules sub: Studies | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101966D |
Same As/Similar To
SB599 (Same As) 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0591)
Subjects
Educational Institutions
General Assembly
Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission (JLARC)
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
General Assembly
Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission (JLARC)
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports