VA HB745 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax; telework expenses tax credit. Provides a tax credit to employers for expenses incurred in allowing employees to telework pursuant to a signed telework agreement for taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2011. An employer would be eligible for a credit of up to $1,200 per teleworking employee, depending on the number of days per month an employee will telework and whether the employer's primary place of business is located in a nonattainment area under the federal Clean Air Act. The aggregate amount of tax credits that will be issued is capped at $1 million annually.
Title
Income tax, state; telework expenses tax credit.
Sponsors
Del. Thomas Rust [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | House: Left in Finance | |
2010-01-29 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-25 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #3 | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102815D |