VA HB746 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0839)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0839)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Toll payments; penalty. Provides that the operator of any toll facility or the locality within which such toll facility is located may install and operate or cause to be installed and operated a video-monitoring system in conjunction with an automatic vehicle identification system on facilities for which tolls are collected for the use of such toll facility for enforcement of toll collection.
Title
Tolls; installation of video-monitoring/automatic vehicle identification systems for toll facility.
Sponsors
Del. Thomas Rust [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (66-Y 29-N) (Y: 67 N: 30 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (75-Y 24-N) (Y: 76 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (32-Y 8-N) (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (75-Y 24-N) (Y: 76 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (66-Y 29-N) (Y: 67 N: 30 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (75-Y 24-N) (Y: 76 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (32-Y 8-N) (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (75-Y 24-N) (Y: 76 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0839) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Enacted, Chapter 839 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB746ER2) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (66-Y 29-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (66-Y 29-N) | |
2010-04-20 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-04-13 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2010-03-13 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-11 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-11 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB746ER) | |
2010-03-11 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-04 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (75-Y 24-N) | |
2010-03-04 | House: Senate amendments agreed to by House (75-Y 24-N) | |
2010-03-03 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (32-Y 8-N) | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (12-Y 2-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-15 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (75-Y 24-N) | |
2010-02-15 | House: Read third time and passed House (75-Y 24-N) | |
2010-02-12 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB746H1 | |
2010-02-12 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10105167D-H1 | |
2010-02-12 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-11 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-09 | House: Committee substitute printed 10105167D-H1 | |
2010-02-09 | House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (20-Y 1-N) | |
2010-02-09 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-22 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #3 | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103795D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 819 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 819.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 819.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |