VA HB747 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-10 - House: Stricken from docket by Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-10 - House: Stricken from docket by Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Destruction of juvenile delinquency records; underage possession of alcohol. Provides that the juvenile court records of a juvenile found delinquent for underage possession of alcohol shall be destroyed no sooner than his 21st birthday.
Title
Juvenile delinquency records; destruction of court records for underage possession of alcohol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-10 | House: Stricken from docket by Courts of Justice by voice vote | |
2012-02-08 | House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote | |
2012-01-16 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102744D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB747 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB747+hil |