VA HB752 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0765)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0765)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Elementary and secondary school students; expulsion. Clarifies that students who have committed certain weapons or drugs offenses are not required to be expelled regardless of the facts of the particular situation.
Title
Student discipline; expulsion due to firearm or drug offenses.
Sponsors
Del. Thomas Rust [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0765) | |
2014-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 765 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB752ER) |
2014-03-03 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-26 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 14105041D-S1 (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB752S1 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14105041D-S1 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14105041D-S1 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-06 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N) |
2014-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House (96-Y 2-N) |
2014-02-05 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-03 | House | Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2014-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2014-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101497D |
Same As/Similar To
HB198 (Same As) 2014-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0312)
SB441 (Same As) 2014-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0109)
SB441 (Same As) 2014-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0109)