VA HB198 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0312)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0312)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Elementary and secondary school students; expulsion. Clarifies that students who have committed certain weapons or drugs offenses are not required to be expelled regardless of the facts of the particular situation.
Title
Student discipline; expulsion due to firearm or drug offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0312) | |
2014-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 312 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB198ER) |
2014-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-06 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-05 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB198H1 |
2014-02-05 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14104600D-H1 |
2014-02-05 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-03 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104600D-H1 |
2014-02-03 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-20 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2013-12-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2013-12-26 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100412D |
Same As/Similar To
HB752 (Same As) 2014-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0765)
SB441 (Same As) 2014-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0109)
SB441 (Same As) 2014-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0109)