VA HB758 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Defeated by Senate (18-Y 21-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Defeated by Senate (18-Y 21-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Probation, revocation, and suspension of sentence; penalty. Makes changes to the definition of a technical violation as it pertains to the revocation of suspension of sentence and probation. The bill also provides that upon a first technical violation, if the court originally suspended the imposition of sentence, the court shall revoke such suspension and again suspend all of this sentence and upon a second or subsequent violation, the court may pronounce whatever sentence might have been originally imposed. The bill also specifies that a violation of a term or condition included in the definition of technical violation shall not be considered a special or specific term or condition for sentencing purposes. Probation, revocation, and suspension of sentence; penalty. Makes changes to the definition of a technical violation as it pertains to the revocation of suspension of sentence and probation. The bill also provides that upon a first technical violation, if the court originally suspended the imposition of sentence, the court shall revoke such suspension and again suspend all of this sentence and upon a second or subsequent violation, the court may pronounce whatever sentence might have been originally imposed. The bill also specifies that a violation of a term or condition included in the definition of technical violation shall not be considered a special or specific term or condition for sentencing purposes. The bill also provides that the court may fix the period of probation and the period of suspension for up to the statutory maximum period for which the defendant might originally have been sentenced to be imposed for any felony offense and up to two years for an offense punishable as a Class 1 or Class 2 misdemeanor. Currently, the limitation on periods of probation and periods of suspension is up to the statutory maximum period of imprisonment for any offense. The bill also adds the offense of crimes against nature committed on or after July 1, 2022, to the list of offenses for which if some period of the sentence for such offense is suspended, the judge is required to order that period of suspension be for the length of time equal to the statutory maximum period for which the defendant might originally have been sentenced to be imprisoned.
Title
Probation, revocation, and suspension of sentence; penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (18-Y 21-N) (Y: 18 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee substitute rejected 22107147SD-S1 (9-Y 30-N) (Y: 9 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 48-N) (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 9-N) (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee substitute rejected 22107147SD-S1 (9-Y 30-N) (Y: 9 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 48-N) (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 9-N) (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Senate | Defeated by Senate (18-Y 21-N) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Edwards agreed to 22107402D-S2 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 22107147SD-S1 (9-Y 30-N) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 22107402D-S2 (Edwards) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22107147D-S1 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (13-Y 2-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-14 | House | VOTE: Passage (52-Y 48-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Read third time and passed House (52-Y 48-N) |
2022-02-11 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB758H1 |
2022-02-11 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22106124D-H1 |
2022-02-11 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-10 | House | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 22106124D-H1 |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 9-N) |
2022-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103759D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 303.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 306.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |