VA HB772 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0245)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0245)
Summary
Virginia Retirement System; exemption from liability for advisory committees. Extends the current exemption from liability to advisory committees appointed by the Virginia Retirement System Board of Trustees. The bill also deletes redundant provisions.
Title
Retirement System; exemption from liability for advisory committees appointed thereby.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Tata [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0245) | |
2008-03-03 | House: Enacted, Chapter 245 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2008-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2008-03-03 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB772ER2) | |
2008-03-03 | House: Reenrolled | |
2008-03-03 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-28 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-28 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-27 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-27 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2008-02-19 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-18 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-18 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB772ER) | |
2008-02-18 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-15 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-15 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-15 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-15 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-15 | Senate: Passed by temporarily | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-01 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-01 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-01 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-31 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-01-30 | House: Read first time | |
2008-01-28 | House: Reported from Appropriations (24-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-15 | House: Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement (Jones, S.C.) | |
2008-01-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2008-01-08 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 088157870 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB772 |