VA HB772 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Real property tax liens. Provides that if a taxpayer agrees, a third party who pays the delinquent taxes due on the taxpayer's real property may be assigned the tax lien on the property.
Title
Real property tax liens; assignment to third party.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Finance |
2014-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely by voice vote |
2014-01-28 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2014-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2014-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101545D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 3018 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3018.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3340 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3930 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 807 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB772 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB772+hil |