VA HB772 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-08 - Stricken from docket by General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-08 - Stricken from docket by General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Administrative Process Act; powers and duties of executive branch agencies; regulatory compliance officer. Provides that each executive branch agency in the Commonwealth authorized to promulgate regulations shall designate one person to serve as the regulatory compliance officer for that agency and provides for the powers and duties of such regulatory compliance officer.
Title
Administrative Process Act; powers and duties of executive branch agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - House - House: Stricken from docket by General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | House | Stricken from docket by General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (6-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101940D |