VA HB775 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-04 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-04 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Disaster Relief Fund established. Creates the Virginia Disaster Relief Fund, to be administered by the Virginia Department of Emergency Management. The bill provides that moneys in the Fund shall be used solely for the purpose of helping Virginia households recover from a natural or man-made disaster and that the Fund shall aid voluntary nonprofit and faith-based organizations, local recovery groups, and local governments to satisfy a disaster household's unmet needs.
Title
Virginia Disaster Relief Fund; established.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-04 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2014-02-05 | House | Continued to 2015 in Appropriations by voice vote |
2014-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2015 by voice vote |
2014-01-27 | House | Assigned App. sub: Public Safety |
2014-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-01-24 | House | Referred from Militia, Police and Public Safety by voice vote |
2014-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2014-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101399D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB775 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB775+hil |