VA HB784 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-03 - House: Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-03 - House: Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax; indexing rates, filing thresholds, personal exemptions, and standard deductions. Indexes to the rate of inflation the amount in the income tax brackets for tax rates, filing thresholds, personal exemptions, and standard deductions, for taxable years beginning on and after January 1, 2010.
Title
Income tax, state; indexing rates, filing thresholds, personal exemptions, and standard deductions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2011 (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-03 | House: Left in Finance | |
2010-02-01 | House: Continued to 2011 in Finance by voice vote | |
2010-01-29 | House: Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2011 (4-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-25 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #3 | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103317D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 320 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 321 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 322 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |