VA HB79 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-28 - Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (9-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-28 - Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (9-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Issuing citations; certain traffic offenses. Removes the provisions that provide that no law-enforcement officer may lawfully stop a motor vehicle for operating (i) without a light illuminating a license plate, (ii) with defective and unsafe equipment, (iii) without brake lights or a high mount stop light, (iv) without an exhaust system that prevents excessive or unusual levels of noise, (v) with certain sun-shading materials and tinting films, and (vi) with certain objects suspended in the vehicle, and the accompanying the exclusionary provisions. Issuing citations; certain traffic offenses. Removes the provisions that provide that no law-enforcement officer may lawfully stop a motor vehicle for operating (i) without a light illuminating a license plate, (ii) with defective and unsafe equipment, (iii) without brake lights or a high mount stop light, (iv) without an exhaust system that prevents excessive or unusual levels of noise, (v) with certain sun-shading materials and tinting films, and (vi) with certain objects suspended in the vehicle, and the accompanying the exclusionary provisions.
Title
Traffic offenses, certain; issuing citations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 45-N) (Y: 52 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 9-N) (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 45-N) (Y: 52 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 9-N) (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (9-Y 6-N) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-11 | House | VOTE: Passage (52-Y 45-N) |
2022-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House (52-Y 45-N) |
2022-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB79H1 |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22105519D-H1 |
2022-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-07 | House | Incorporates HB1030 (Austin) |
2022-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 22105519D-H1 |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 9-N) |
2022-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102406D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1030 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
HB1030 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
HB1030 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 919 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 1302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1003 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1013 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1014 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1014.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1030 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1049 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1052 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1054 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1094 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1157 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1300 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 334.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 646 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 810.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 923 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 926 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |