VA HB802 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - VOTE: (48-Y 52-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - VOTE: (48-Y 52-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; enforcement by localities. Provides that if a condition exists in a rental dwelling unit that constitutes a material noncompliance by the landlord with the rental agreement or with any provision of law that, if not promptly corrected, constitutes a fire hazard or serious threat to the life, health, or safety of tenants or occupants of the premises, a locality may bring an action to enforce the landlord's duty to maintain the rental dwelling in a fit and habitable condition, provided that (i) the property where the violations occurred is within the jurisdictional boundaries of the locality; (ii) the locality has notified the landlord who owns the property directly or through the managing agent of the nature of the violations and the landlord has not remedied the violations within a reasonable time after receiving such notice to the satisfaction of the locality; and (iii) such enforcement action may include seeking an injunction, damages, or both. Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; enforcement by localities. Provides that if a condition exists in a rental dwelling unit that constitutes a material noncompliance by the landlord with the rental agreement or with any provision of law that, if not promptly corrected, constitutes a fire hazard or serious threat to the life, health, or safety of tenants or occupants of the premises, a locality may bring an action to enforce the landlord's duty to maintain the rental dwelling in a fit and habitable condition, provided that (i) the property where the violations occurred is within the jurisdictional boundaries of the locality; (ii) the locality has notified the landlord who owns the property directly or through the managing agent of the nature of the violations and the landlord has not remedied the violations within a reasonable time after receiving such notice to the satisfaction of the locality; and (iii) such enforcement action may include seeking an injunction, damages, or both.
Title
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; enforcement by localities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - House - House: VOTE: (48-Y 52-N) (Y: 48 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (59-Y 41-N) (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (59-Y 41-N) (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | House | VOTE: (48-Y 52-N) |
2022-04-27 | House | House sustained Governor's veto (48-Y 52-N) |
2022-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB802ER) |
2022-03-03 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-14 | House | VOTE: Passage (59-Y 41-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Read third time and passed House (59-Y 41-N) |
2022-02-11 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB802H1 |
2022-02-11 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22105909D-H1 |
2022-02-11 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-08 | House | Committee substitute printed 22105909D-H1 |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-26 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22104059D |