VA HB819 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; public access to certain audio and video recordings. Requires the release of any audio or video recording or combination thereof made by a correctional officer, jail officer, or deputy sheriff of an individual imprisoned in a penal institution in the Commonwealth being subdued by the correctional officer, jail officer, or deputy sheriff in a manner that results in the death of the individual being subdued or rendering him unconscious. The bill defines "correctional officer," "jail officer," and "deputy sheriff." The requirement applies to any audio or video recording that exists on or after July 1, 2016, regardless of when the audio or video recording was made. The bill contains a technical amendment.
Title
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; public access to certain audio and video recordings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in General Laws |
2016-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-18 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2016-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103656D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB819 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB819+hil |