VA HB819 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - Stricken from docket by General Laws (21-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - Stricken from docket by General Laws (21-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Small Business and Supplier Diversity; collecting and reporting local tax data. Directs the Department of Small Business and Supplier Diversity (SBSD) to establish a pilot program to use the administration of the business, professional, and occupational license tax (the BPOL tax) to collect data from businesses regarding their eligibility for certification as women-owned or minority-owned businesses. The bill requires the Department to aggregate and anonymize such data and report annually to the Governor and General Assembly on the results.
Title
Small Business and Supplier Diversity, Department of; collecting and reporting local tax data.
Sponsors
Del. Luke Torian [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-03 - House - House: Stricken from docket by General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | House | Stricken from docket by General Laws (21-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102929D |