VA HB847 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Public institutions of higher education; tuition assistance for non-Virginia students; proceeds from state debt and revenues generated from state taxes and fees. Prohibits each public institution of higher education from using any proceeds from state debt or revenues generated from state taxes and fees that are appropriated to such institution to offer any form of tuition assistance to any non-Virginia student and requires each public institution of higher education to separately account for such proceeds and revenues and provide a report of expenditures from such account to the House Committee on Appropriations and the Senate Committee on Finance upon the request of such committees.
Title
Higher educational institutions; tuition assistance for non-Virginia students.
Sponsors
Del. Timothy Hugo [R] | Del. David Albo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2016-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-15 | House | Assigned App. sub: Higher Education |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100792D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB847 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB847+hil |