VA HB879 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0790)
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0790)
Summary
Affordable dwelling unit ordinances. Provides that a locality establishing an affordable housing dwelling unit program in any ordinance may establish a requirement that the prices for resales and rerentals be controlled by the local housing authority or local governing body or designee for a period of not less than 15 years, but not to exceed 50 years, after the initial sale or rental transaction for each affordable dwelling unit, provided that the ordinance further provides for reasonable rules and regulations to implement a price control provision. Under current law, the prices for resales and rerentals may be controlled by the local housing authority or local governing body or designee for a period of 50 years after the initial sale or rental transaction for each affordable dwelling unit. HB 330 (McClellan) is incorporated into this bill.
Title
Affordable dwelling unit ordinances; may establish requirement that prices for resale be controlled.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0790) | |
2008-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 790 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-26 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-24 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-24 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB879ER) | |
2008-03-24 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-03-07 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (89-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-07 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (89-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-07 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) | |
2008-03-07 | Senate: Reading of conference report waived | |
2008-03-07 | Senate: Passed by temporarily | |
2008-03-05 | Senate: Senators: Herring, Locke, Stuart | |
2008-03-05 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2008-03-04 | House: Delegates: Loupassi, Suit, McClellan | |
2008-03-04 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2008-03-04 | House: House acceded to request | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Senate requested conference committee | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-29 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-27 | House: VOTE: --- REJECTED (36-Y 60-N) | |
2008-02-27 | House: Senate amendment rejected by House (36-Y 60-N) | |
2008-02-26 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-25 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-21 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-19 | Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-12 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-12 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB879H1 | |
2008-02-11 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 081872606-H1 | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-09 | House: Committee substitute printed 081872606-H1 | |
2008-02-08 | House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-28 | House: Assigned GL sub: Housing | |
2008-01-25 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2008-01-25 | House: Referred from Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote | |
2008-01-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2008-01-08 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 086998606 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB879 |