VA HB880 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-12 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Status: Introduced on January 8 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-12 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Summary
Interest on fines and costs. Provides that interest on fines and costs shall not accrue while a person is incarcerated. Currently, fines and costs do not accrue during incarceration but only with respect to the case resulting in the incarceration. The bill also allows a person to move for and a circuit court to grant a waiver on any interest accrued during his incarceration prior to July 1, 2008.
Title
Incarceration; waiving interest during period thereof.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-12 | House: Left in Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-16 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2008-01-08 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-08 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 080331806 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB880 |