VA HB889 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0493)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0493)
Summary
Required driving hours for holders of learner's permits. Increases the minimum driving hours from 40 to 45 hours, at least 15 of which must be after sunset. The bill additionally requires, on a form supplied by DMV, certification of the hours driven.
Title
Learner's permits; certification statement required for persons under age 18.
Sponsors
Del. Clifford Athey [R] | Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Matthew Lohr [R] | Del. James Massie [R] |
Del. Donald Merricks [R] | Del. Harvey Morgan [R] | Del. Beverly Sherwood [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0493) | |
2008-03-08 | House: Enacted, Chapter 493 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2008-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2008-03-08 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB889ER2) | |
2008-03-08 | House: Reenrolled | |
2008-03-08 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-07 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION #2 (94-Y 4-N) | |
2008-03-07 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (94-Y 4-N) | |
2008-03-07 | House: Passed by temporarily | |
2008-03-07 | House: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to | |
2008-03-06 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 3-N) | |
2008-03-06 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (95-Y 3-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-03-05 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-21 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-20 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB889ER) | |
2008-02-20 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-19 | Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) | |
2008-02-19 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-19 | Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) | |
2008-02-19 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-18 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 1-N) | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-01-29 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-01-29 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (94-Y 4-N) | |
2008-01-29 | House: Read third time and passed House (94-Y 4-N) | |
2008-01-28 | House: Printed as engrossed 083489604-E | |
2008-01-28 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB889E | |
2008-01-28 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2008-01-28 | House: Read second time | |
2008-01-25 | House: Read first time | |
2008-01-24 | House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-14 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: 2 | |
2008-01-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2008-01-08 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 083489604 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB889 |