VA HB903 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0551)
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0551)
Summary
Magistrates. Reforms the magistrate system by transferring appointment and supervisory responsibilities from the circuit court judges to the Executive Secretary of the Supreme Court, although the chief judges of the circuit courts in the region are to be consulted regarding appointments. Magistrates initially appointed on or after July 1, 2008, must have a bachelor's degree from an accredited college and persons appointed chief magistrates on or after July 1, 2008, are required to be members in good standing of the Virginia State Bar. No magistrate appointed on or after July 1, 2008, may practice law. No magistrate may engage in any other business without the approval of the Executive Secretary. Magistrates will have to serve an initial nine-month probationary period (currently, six months), complete a minimum training program and pass a certification exam. The bill broadens magistrates' geographical assignment from within a particular judicial district to regions established by the Executive Secretary. The bill makes technical amendments replacing "justice of the peace" with "magistrate" and removes references to magistrates serving only within a particular jurisdiction or district. This bill is identical to
Title
Magistrates; reforms system by transferring appointment and supervisory responsibilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0551) | |
2008-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 551 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-03 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB903ER) | |
2008-03-03 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-27 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-27 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-12 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-12 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (84-Y 13-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read third time and passed House (84-Y 13-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Printed as engrossed 081725866-E | |
2008-02-11 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB903E | |
2008-02-11 | House: Amendment by Delegate Moran agreed to | |
2008-02-11 | House: Committee amendment from Appropriations agreed to | |
2008-02-11 | House: Committee amendments from Courts of Justice agreed to | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-08 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-06 | House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (24-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-05 | House: Assigned App. sub: General Government (Abbitt) | |
2008-02-01 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2008-02-01 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (12-Y 10-N) | |
2008-01-16 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Judicial Panel | |
2008-01-08 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-08 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 081725866 |
Same As/Similar To
SB244 (Same As) 2010-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0041)
Subjects
Agriculture, Horticulture and Food
Criminal Procedure
Fire Protection
Mental Health, Mental Retardation, and Substance Abuse Services
Criminal Procedure
Fire Protection
Mental Health, Mental Retardation, and Substance Abuse Services
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB903 |