VA HB917 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0459)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0459)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation; definition of a real estate broker. Adds to the definition of "real estate broker" any individual or business entity who sells or offers to sell, buys or offers to buy, negotiates, or otherwise deals in real estate contracts, including assignable contracts, on two or more occasions in any 12-month period for compensation or valuable consideration.
Title
Real estate broker; definition.
Sponsors
Del. Irene Shin [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0459) | |
2024-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 459 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB917ER) |
2024-02-27 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-21 | House | VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-21 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-05 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-02 | House | Printed as engrossed 24104608D-E |
2024-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB917E |
2024-02-02 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2024-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2024-01-30 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-23 | House | Assigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104608D |
Same As/Similar To
SB358 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0621)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 3521.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2107 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1616 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |