VA SB358 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0621)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0621)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation; definition of a real estate broker. Adds to the definition of "real estate broker" any individual or business entity who sells or offers to sell, buys or offers to buy, negotiates, or otherwise deals in real estate contracts, including assignable contracts, on two or more occasions in any 12-month period for compensation or valuable consideration.
Title
Real estate broker; definition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0621) | |
2024-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 621 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB358ER) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-02-20 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-20 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-15 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 24104480D-E |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB358E |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104480D |
Same As/Similar To
HB917 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0459)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 3521.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2107 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1616 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |