VA HB952 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Environmental Quality; nonfederally managed hazardous waste sites; inventory. Directs the Department of Environmental Quality (DEQ) to publish and update annually a Virginia Nonfederally Managed Hazardous Waste Site Inventory, consisting of a list of sites of which DEQ is aware that meet certain criteria regarding the presence of hazardous wastes or other hazardous substances but that are not listed on the federal National Priorities List. The bill also requires an owner of an inactive nonfederally managed hazardous waste site, as defined in the bill, to notify DEQ of its existence.
Title
Nonfederally managed hazardous waste sites; DEQ to publish and update annually.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) |
2018-01-23 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101605D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 1186.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 1428.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |