VA HB960 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0462)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0462)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Historic rehabilitation tax credit; maximum amount of tax credit. Increases from $5 million to $7.5 million, beginning in taxable year 2025, the maximum amount of the historic rehabilitation tax credit, including amounts carried over from prior taxable years, that may be claimed by a taxpayer in any taxable year.
Title
Historic rehabilitation; maximum amount of tax credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (78-Y 19-N) (Y: 78 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N) (Y: 0 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (62-Y 37-N) (Y: 62 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Finance (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (78-Y 19-N) (Y: 78 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N) (Y: 0 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (62-Y 37-N) (Y: 62 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Finance (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0462) | |
2024-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 462 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 27, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB960ER) |
2024-03-25 | House | Enrolled |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N) |
2024-03-06 | House | VOTE: Adoption (78-Y 19-N) |
2024-03-06 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (78-Y 19-N) |
2024-03-06 | House | Conference substitute printed 24108726D-H1 |
2024-03-06 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senators: Williams Graves, Surovell, Locke |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2024-02-28 | House | Delegates: Lopez, Mundon King, Bloxom |
2024-02-28 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2024-02-28 | House | House acceded to request |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 24108322D-S1 (0-Y 98-N) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB960S1 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24108322D-S1 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24108322D-S1 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-13 | House | VOTE: Passage (62-Y 37-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House (62-Y 37-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Printed as engrossed 24101549D-E |
2024-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB960E |
2024-02-12 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2024-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-07 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (14-Y 8-N) |
2024-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N) |
2024-02-06 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-31 | House | Reported from Finance (13-Y 9-N) |
2024-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2024-01-25 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101549D |
Same As/Similar To
SB556 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0512)