VA HB983 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Health and Human Services
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Health and Human Services
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Nurse practitioners; patient care team provider; autonomous practice. Allows certain nurse practitioners to oversee patient care teams by changing "patient care team physician" to "patient care team provider." The bill defines "patient care team provider" as a patient care team physician, as defined in relevant law, or a nurse practitioner who meets certain requirements. The bill also lowers from five years to two years the amount of full-time clinical experience required before an advanced practice registered nurse may practice without a practice agreement. Nurse practitioners; patient care team provider; autonomous practice. Allows certain nurse practitioners to oversee patient care teams by changing "patient care team physician" to "patient care team provider." The bill defines "patient care team provider" as a patient care team physician, as defined in relevant law, or a nurse practitioner who meets certain requirements. The bill also lowers from five years to two years the amount of full-time clinical experience required before an advanced practice registered nurse may practice without a practice agreement.
Title
Nurse practitioners; patient care team provider, autonomous practice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Health and Human Services |
2024-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-19 | House | Assigned sub: Health Professions |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104697D |
Same As/Similar To
HB971 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0404)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2957 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2957.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |