VA HJR133 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ133ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ133ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Postural Orthostatic Tachycardia Syndrome Awareness Month. Designating October, in 2020 and in each succeeding year, as Postural Orthostatic Tachycardia Syndrome Awareness Month in Virginia.
Title
Postural Orthostatic Tachycardia Syndrome Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ133ER) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Reading waived |
2020-01-29 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (95-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House |
2020-01-29 | House | Taken up |
2020-01-24 | House | Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-10 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20104141D |